NV AB18 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; revising the definitions of certain terms related to the provision of information services to using agencies by the Division of Enterprise Information Technology Services of the Department of Administration; revising the composition of the Division; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Division of Enterprise Information Technology Services of the Department of Administration. (BDR 19-218)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |