NV AB17 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to convicted persons; eliminating the distinction between an honorable discharge and a dishonorable discharge from probation or parole; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the discharge of certain persons from probation or parole. (BDR 14-334)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 71.) To printer. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |