NV AB150 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special license plates; revising provisions governing certain terminations and suspensions of certain special license plates; revising provisions governing certain fees collected by the Department of Motor Vehicles on behalf of certain charitable organizations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to punitive actions concerning special license plates. (BDR 43-473)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 14. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |