NV AB134 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to privileges; revising provisions relating to the privilege of confidential communication between victims of certain crimes and advocates for those victims; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing privileges. (BDR 4-694)
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Rep. Ellen Spiegel [D] | Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] |
Rep. Sandra Jauregui [D] | Rep. Heidi Swank [D] | Rep. Jill Tolles [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Chapter 18. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 18.) To printer. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |