NV AB133 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 27.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 27.
Summary
Establishes provisions concerning the disbursement of escrow money in real estate transactions. (BDR 54-647)
Title
Establishes provisions concerning the disbursement of escrow money in real estate transactions. (BDR 54-647)
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Anderson [D] | Rep. Marcus Conklin [D] | Rep. Tom Grady [R] | Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D] |
Rep. Harry Mortenson [D] | Rep. John Oceguera [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Rep. Bonnie Parnell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 27. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-24 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | In Senate. | |
2009-03-11 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-03-10 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-09 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=288 |