NV AB118 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; revising provisions relating to the transportation of children in motor vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the transportation of children in motor vehicles. (BDR 43-209)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 462.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 56.) To printer. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |