NV AB117 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 148.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 148.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to parole hearings. (BDR 16-630)
Title
Makes various changes relating to parole hearings. (BDR 16-630)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 148. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 360.) To printer. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-28 | From printer. | |
2009-01-27 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=259 |