NV AB111 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Welfare and Supportive Services of the Department of Health and Human Services to use money in the Fund for Energy Assistance and Conservation to assist certain low-income households in paying for Internet service. (BDR 58-641)
Title
Authorizes the Division of Welfare and Supportive Services of the Department of Health and Human Services to use money in the Fund for Energy Assistance and Conservation to assist certain low-income households in paying for Internet service. (BDR 58-641)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 40.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |