NV AB110 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing court sanctions for certain conduct in civil actions. (BDR 2-648)
Title
Revises provisions governing court sanctions for certain conduct in civil actions. (BDR 2-648)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |