NV AB1 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the payment of certain undergraduate fees and expenses of the dependent child of a public employee who is killed in the performance of his or her duties. (BDR 34-69)
Title
Requires the payment of certain undergraduate fees and expenses of the dependent child of a public employee who is killed in the performance of his or her duties. (BDR 34-69)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 3.) To printer. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-15 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |