NM SM69 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education of children in juvenile justice
Title
Education of children in juvenile justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |