NM SM68 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nm children's foundation, in recognition
Title
Nm children's foundation, in recognition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action all committees |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |