NM SM63 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Community Solar Working Group

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Solar Working Group

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseSigned by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
2020-02-17SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2020-02-15SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-12SenateSent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback