NM SM33 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (37-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (37-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maximize access to federal grant funding
Title
Maximize access to federal grant funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (37-0) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |