NM SJR7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (66-2) Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (66-2) Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Northern nm state school regents, ca
Title
Northern nm state school regents, ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (66-2) Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 2). |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Education |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Education and then to House Voters & Elections |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |