NM SJM6 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Santa cruz dam improvements
Title
Santa cruz dam improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (61-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Conservation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |