NM SJM4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Monthly medicaid benefits explanations
Title
Monthly medicaid benefits explanations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (32-5) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |