NM SJM20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"santa fe community college day"
Title
"santa fe community college day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-06 | House | [LD 17] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2013-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to S |