NM SB637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Local Gov't Transportation Project Fund
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-12 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-09 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to: SCORC |
2019-03-01 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Not Printed |