NM SB552 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking water system financing
Title
Drinking water system financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.142. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |