NM SB519 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters' survivors fund
Title
Firefighters' survivors fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 24. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HWMC |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |