NM SB412 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Escrow company bonds & audits
Title
Escrow company bonds & audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (67-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.135. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] HGEIC |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |