NM SB41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (59-5) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (59-5) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial driver's license retesting
Title
Commercial driver's license retesting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (59-5) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 67. |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (32-8) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |