NM SB4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb.10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb.10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Complete Count In 2020 Census
Title
Complete Count In 2020 Census
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb.10 |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2020-02-03 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-30 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-27 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |