NM SB4 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Carlsbad Brine Well Authority & Fund
Title
Carlsbad Brine Well Authority & Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 118 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (64-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Energy & Natural Resources |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HLELC |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HLELC and then to House Energy & Natural Resources |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (39-2) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |