NM SB395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 228 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 228 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Probate Code Changes
Title
Uniform Probate Code Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Daymon Ely [D] | Sen. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 228 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |