NM SB39 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College district bonds for hard & software
Title
College district bonds for hard & software
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 37. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (39-1) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |