NM SB356 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 168 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 168 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board & Commission Sunset Dates
Title
Board & Commission Sunset Dates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 168 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:2 |
2019-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-03 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-18 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |