NM SB352 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.216.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.216.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Airline employee shifts and hours
Title
Airline employee shifts and hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.216. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (53-15) |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | [LD 31] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |
2013-02-26 | House | [LD 31] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |