NM SB296 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drug insurance coverage review
Title
Prescription drug insurance coverage review
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.4) Ch.170. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Business & Industry |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |