NM SB286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "access aisle" in motor vehicle code
Title
Defining "access aisle" in motor vehicle code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 78. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP-HJC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HTPWC/HJC-HTPWC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP - PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SCORC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC |