NM SB268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fertilizer act terms & penalties
Title
Fertilizer act terms & penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.112. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (61-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |