NM SB250 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - [LD 23] Failed passage in Senate (19-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - [LD 23] Failed passage in Senate (19-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit use of state aircraft
Title
Limit use of state aircraft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 19 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Failed passage in Senate (19-22). |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |