NM SB2 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric Vehicle Income Tax Credit
Title
Electric Vehicle Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Abbas Akhil [D] | Sen. Bill Tallman [D] | Rep. Jim Trujillo [D] | Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-19 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-18 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:19 N:18 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SCORC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |