NM SB195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-18 - [LD 4] Signed by one or both houses (Feb.4) Ch. 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-18 - [LD 4] Signed by one or both houses (Feb.4) Ch. 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"bataan-corregidor heritage month"
Title
"bataan-corregidor heritage month"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-30 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Signed by one or both houses (Feb.4) Ch. 2. |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to S |