NM SB159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conviction Records For Cdl Holders
Title
Conviction Records For Cdl Holders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |