NM SB148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (50-17) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.95.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (50-17) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.95.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No use of gender for health insurance rating
Title
No use of gender for health insurance rating
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (50-17) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.95. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP - PASSED/S (23-15) | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP-SCORC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] germane-SPAC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SCC/SPAC/SCORC-SCC |