NM SB146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 55 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 55 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Defense Force
Title
State Defense Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 55 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2021-03-11 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-26 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HJC |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |