NM SB132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sti Prevention & Treatment
Title
Sti Prevention & Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 99 - Apr. 4 |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:23 |
2023-03-10 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-08 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-27 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCPAC |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:13 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-06 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/STBTC |