NM SB106 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nmfa Water Project Fund Projects
Title
Nmfa Water Project Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52 |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (62-0) |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |