NM HJR13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bernalillo Exclusive Legislative Jurisdiction
Title
Bernalillo Exclusive Legislative Jurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. James Dines [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (60-1) |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |