NM HJM7 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-26 - [LD 5] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-26 - [LD 5] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"new mexico hunger week"
Title
"new mexico hunger week"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2015-01-27 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (70-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |