NM HJM6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sandia Science & Tech Park 20th Anniversary
Title
Sandia Science & Tech Park 20th Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCORC |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-01-24 | House | Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled |