NM HJM23 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - [LD 37] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - [LD 37] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Academic champions task force
Title
Academic champions task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP API. | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] SEC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (44-22) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] HAFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=23&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM023.pdf |