NM HJM20 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] fl/a- PASSED/S (38-0) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] fl/a- PASSED/S (38-0) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american voting rights
Title
Native american voting rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] fl/a- PASSED/S (38-0) API. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] SRC/SJC-SRC | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HVEC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=20&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM020.pdf |