NM HJM11 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - [LD 10] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - [LD 10] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"colonias day at the legislature"
Title
"colonias day at the legislature"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] SGND. | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] tbld/S- w/drn - PASSED/S (28-0) | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP - PASSED/H (57-0) | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=11&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM011.pdf |