NM HJM10 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pass Fix It America Constitutional Amendment
Title
Pass Fix It America Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] h and then to cncrd |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (26-15) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (41-28) |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Floor amendment adopted |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |