NM HB92 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stricter Game & Fish Violation Penalties
Title
Stricter Game & Fish Violation Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | House | [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 38 |
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (37-2) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (66-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Energy & Natural Resources |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Energy & Natural Resources and then to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |