NM HB610 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Programs For Women In Oil & Gas Industry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Programs For Women In Oil & Gas Industry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-03-16SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2019-03-14SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-09SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-27SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCONC
2019-02-26HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
2019-02-25HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-14HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback