NM HB552 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School investment of public money
Title
School investment of public money
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] HWMC |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Education |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Assigned to House Education and then to HWMC |